House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1834 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1438 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1425 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1425 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Eckhardt | Journal Page: 1381 |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Eckhardt | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Middleton | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1402 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1260 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |