E
|
05/01/2025
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#792
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote RV#792
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1979
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#659
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1636
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 861
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|