House | 05/07/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Public hearing continued on . . . | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2759 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2029 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2029 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1862 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1456 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1456 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1456 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1456 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1456 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1456 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1456 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Bettencourt | Journal Page: 1455 |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA2 West | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1455 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1092 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 245 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 245 | |
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 73 | |
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 65 | |
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |