Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#799
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote RV#799
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Guillen
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Reynolds
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote RV#798
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Guillen
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#684
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Record vote RV#684
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Record vote RV#683
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Amended
|
1-Toth
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Amended 1-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1638
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 542
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 514
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 514
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 514
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 514
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
|
|
Journal Page: 514
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 250
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 250
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|