House
|
05/01/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2647
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1347
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1035
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1018
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1018
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 995
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 995
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 994
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 808
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 252
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 252
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|