Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB921 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2025
Analysis January 24, 2025
Fiscal Note January 24, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 30, 2025
Bill April 30, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 31, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025
Fiscal Note March 31, 2025
Bill March 31, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025
Analysis March 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2025
Bill March 31, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 27, 2025
Fiscal Note March 10, 2025