House | 05/02/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to s/c on Telecommunications & Broadband by Speaker | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 879 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 809 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 787 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 787 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 787 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 787 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 786 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 252 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 252 | |
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |