Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB924 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 24, 2025
Analysis January 24, 2025
Bill January 24, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 31, 2025
Fiscal Note March 31, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 26, 2025
Witness List March 26, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2025
Fiscal Note March 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 26, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 14, 2025