House | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2749 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 825 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 256 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 256 | |
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |