House
|
05/07/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1096
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1084
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 808
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|