Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | 1 | By: Nichols S.B. No. 996 | |
2 | - | ||
3 | - | ||
2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2025; February 13, 2025, | |
3 | + | read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government; | |
4 | + | March 31, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, | |
5 | + | Nays 0; March 31, 2025, sent to printer.) | |
6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote | |
4 | 7 | ||
5 | 8 | ||
6 | 9 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
7 | 10 | AN ACT | |
8 | 11 | relating to fireworks sales to the public by retail fireworks | |
9 | 12 | permit holders on certain dates. | |
10 | 13 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
11 | 14 | SECTION 1. Section 2154.202, Occupations Code, is amended | |
12 | 15 | by adding Subsection (g-1) to read as follows: | |
13 | 16 | (g-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (g), a retail fireworks | |
14 | 17 | permit holder may sell fireworks only to the public during the | |
15 | 18 | period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on July 5, 2026, and ending at 11:59 | |
16 | 19 | p.m. on July 5, 2026. This subsection expires September 1, 2026. | |
17 | 20 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. | |
21 | + | * * * * * |