Senate | 04/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1504 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 386 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 386 | |
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |