House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1080 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1080 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1080 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1080 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 386 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 386 | |
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |