Senate | 04/10/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 883 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 847 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |