House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 139 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 139 | |
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |