Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR7

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 15, 2025, and ending on Wednesday, January 22, 2025.

Impact

The adoption of SCR7 reflects a procedural measure that adheres to constitutional requirements while allowing flexibility in legislative scheduling. Its approval by both houses—receiving a unanimous vote in the Senate and substantial support in the House—indicates a general consensus among legislators regarding the need for effective session management. By granting the ability to adjourn for an extended period, the resolution could impact legislative strategies and timings of future discussions or votes on significant issues during that session.

Summary

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 7 (SCR7) was introduced during the 89th Legislature of the State of Texas, proposing that both houses of the legislature grant each other permission to adjourn for more than three days. This resolution applies specifically to the period beginning January 15, 2025, and ending January 22, 2025. The necessity for such a resolution arises from Section 17, Article III of the Texas Constitution, which stipulates that neither house may adjourn for more than three days without the consent of the other. This resolution aims to ensure legislative continuity and facilitate administrative preparation for the specified timeframe.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR7 appears to be positive, signified by the overwhelming votes in favor. Legislators from both chambers recognize the importance of maintaining order and structure in the legislative process. While no substantial opposition was recorded, the resolution is largely seen as a procedural necessity and not as a contentious political issue. The broad support points to a collaborative spirit among the legislature in addressing operational needs.

Contention

SCR7 did not exhibit any notable points of contention during discussions or votes, as evidenced by the consensus reached in both legislative chambers. Its nature as a resolution solely addressing procedural rules minimizes the potential for debate or disagreement. Legislators unitedly recognize the importance of adhering to the constitutional framework while also allowing for necessary operational adjustments. As a result, no significant dissent or points of conflict arose in relation to SCR7.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.