House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2852 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 910 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 848 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |