House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1590 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1590 | |
House | 04/10/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1015 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1015 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1015 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1015 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |