LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
Senate
Bills
SR116
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SR116
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR116
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
02/18/2025
Senate Floor Action Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SR61
Introduced
Last Action: 02/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR91
Introduced
Last Action: 02/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR97
Introduced
Last Action: 02/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR103
Introduced
Last Action: 02/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR104
Introduced
Last Action: 02/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR112
Introduced
Last Action: 02/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR115
Introduced
Last Action: 02/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR116
Introduced
Last Action: 02/24/2025 S Printed in full
SCR16
Introduced
Last Action: 02/20/2025 E Filed with the Secretary of State
SB26
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM