Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 02/26/2025 S Printed in full
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/17/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Mar 17 2025 3:28PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)