Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR219 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/06/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 219
 In Memory
 of
 Dennis Watters III
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life filled with joyful times and
 meaningful accomplishments remain to comfort the family and
 friends of Dennis Watters III of Willow Park, who passed away on
 February 16, 2025, at the age of 81; and
 WHEREAS, Dennis Watters was born in Fort Worth on
 December 17, 1943, and he spent much of his childhood in Lajitas
 and the Big Bend area with his grandparents; he attended Sul Ross
 State University on a bull riding scholarship and studied
 geology; answering his nation's call to duty, he served for a
 total of 28 years in the U.S. Army Reserve and the National Guard
 and was deployed to Fort Leonard Wood, Missouri, during Operation
 Desert Storm; and
 WHEREAS, While living in Fort Worth, Mr. Watters met his
 future wife, Sherry; the couple exchanged wedding vows on
 December 15, 1972, and they shared a rewarding marriage that
 spanned more than five decades; they raised two children, John
 and Michelle, and later welcomed a granddaughter into their
 family; Mr. Watters gave generously of his time to Westridge
 Baptist Church in Fort Worth, where he led Sunday school classes
 and provided assistance to the church youth group; in 1987, he
 and his family moved to Weatherford and became members of Peaster
 Baptist Church; Mr. Watters also served that congregation, and
 most recently, he attended Willow Park Baptist Church; and
 WHEREAS, In his later years, Mr. Watters discovered a
 passion for motorcycles; he belonged to the Koinonia Riders in
 Weatherford, a chapter of the Christian Motorcyclists
 Association, and he enjoyed riding through the Texas Hill
 Country; and
 WHEREAS, Those who were privileged to share in this
 esteemed man's love and friendship will always remember him with
 great admiration and affection; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 89th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Dennis Watters III
 and extend heartfelt condolences to the members of his family: to
 his wife, Sherry Watters; to his children, John David and
 Michelle Leigh; to his granddaughter, Taylor Paige; and to his
 other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Dennis Watters.
 King
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 6, 2025, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate