Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR242 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/12/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Senate appoints conferees-reported
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Signed in the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S House passage as amended reported
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/12/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/12/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/12/2025 S Reported enrolled
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)