Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR252 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/13/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 252
 In Memory
 of
 Karolyn Perry
 WHEREAS, All who shared in the life of Karolyn Ferrell
 Perry of Tyler were deeply saddened by her passing on
 January 31, 2025, at the age of 78; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Claude Vernon Ferrell and Rena
 Jennise Ferrell, the former Karolyn Ferrell was born in Beaumont
 on November 22, 1946, and she grew up with the companionship of a
 sister, Claudia; during her senior year at French High School,
 she sang alto in a folk group, where she met the love of her life,
 Thomas McDow Perry Jr.; and
 WHEREAS, The couple married on July 20, 1968, and they were
 blessed with three children, Stephanie, Todd, and Alicia;
 through the years, their treasured family grew to include six
 grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Perry spent several years working as a
 special education teacher and more than two and a half decades as
 a homemaker; a talented artist and seamstress, she created many
 paintings, calligraphy projects, articles of clothing, and home
 décor items; above all else, she was devoted to her family and to
 her faith; and
 WHEREAS, Although Karolyn Perry is greatly missed,
 memories of her grace, her resilience, and her dedication to her
 loved ones remain to comfort and inspire those she leaves behind;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 89th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Karolyn Ferrell
 Perry and extend sincere condolences to the members of her
 family: to her husband, Thomas McDow Perry Jr.; to her children,
 Stephanie Perry, Todd Perry and his wife, Michelle, and Alicia
 Sparkman and her husband, Travis; to her grandchildren; to her
 sisters-in-law, Linda Howland and Frances Perry; to her sister,
 Claudia Ferrell McKeller; to her adopted aunt, Janet Townsend;
 and to her many other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Karolyn Perry.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 13, 2025, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate