Last Action: 04/28/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:52PM
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)