LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
Senate
Bills
SR302
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SR302
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR302
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/20/2025
Senate Floor Action Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SB57
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB499
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
SB974
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
SB1025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB1061
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
SB1268
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SR302
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 S Printed in full
SR303
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR304
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR305
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 S Printed in full
SB30
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
SB1333
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
SB1666
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Corrections: May 2 2025 2:03PM