Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR321 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/26/2025
Enrolled
Last Action: 04/23/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:16PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Insurance: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Printed in full
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Reported enrolled