Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR351 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/02/2025
SB7
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Reported enrolled
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported enrolled
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to s/c on Transportation Funding by Speaker: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 S Reported enrolled