Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR356 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/31/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 7:22PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 S Printed in full
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/13/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Left pending in committee