Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR377 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/08/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Elections: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Printed in full
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/16/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice