Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Elections: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Human Services: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Human Services: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Human Services: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Environmental Regulation: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Human Services: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to s/c on Transportation Funding by Speaker: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Insurance: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Printed in full
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House