Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR455 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/29/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 455
 In Memory
 of
 William Howell
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of William D. Howell of Lubbock on November 4, 2023, at
 the age of 94; and
 WHEREAS, The son of William and Emma Jane Howell, "Bud"
 Howell was born in Minerva on August 27, 1929, and he grew up with
 the companionship of a sister, Susie; during the Korean War, he
 answered his nation's call to duty and enlisted in the U.S. Navy,
 where he served on a destroyer; and
 WHEREAS, Returning to civilian life, Mr. Howell trained in
 1960 as a member of the 12th Texas Game Warden Training Academy
 class; he went on to work in several East Texas counties before
 making his home in the town of Post, and in 1991, he retired after
 more than three decades of distinguished service; and
 WHEREAS, On November 3, 2011, Mr. Howell wed Ann Bishop and
 the couple shared a rewarding marriage that spanned 12 years; he
 was a man of strong faith, and he also enjoyed spending time
 outdoors; and
 WHEREAS, Although Bud Howell will be deeply missed, he has
 left his family and friends with a wealth of memories that they
 will forever treasure; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 89th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of William D. Howell
 and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to
 his wife, Ann Bishop; to his stepdaughter, Kelly Maner, and her
 husband, Wade; to his step-granddaughter, Amy Maner; to his
 sister, Susie Weems; to his nephew, Ted Weems, and his wife, Amy;
 to his niece, Diane Fishero, and her husband, John; and to his
 other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Bud Howell.
 Perry
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 29, 2025, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate