Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR457 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/29/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 457
 In Memory
 of
 Edna Belle Pemberton
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the
 citizens of Dallas in mourning the loss of Edna Belle Pemberton,
 who died April 13, 2025, at the age of 81; and
 WHEREAS, Edna was born in Chicago on March 27, 1944, as the
 youngest of nine children; after losing her mother and growing up
 in the foster care system from a young age, Edna was led to a life
 of service, and she went on to commit much of her time, energy,
 and talents as a tireless advocate for positive change, a voice
 for her community, and a force for good; and
 WHEREAS, Edna met the love of her life, the late DarNell
 Pemberton, while attending church as a teenager in Chicago, and
 they married on September 19, 1964; Edna and DarNell were blessed
 with four daughters, and throughout more than four decades
 together, they built a rewarding partnership founded on
 boundless love and their dedication to serving their family and
 community; they went on to adopt and help raise eight of her
 nieces, nephews, and young relatives, and their family of 14
 resided in California before relocating to Dallas and settling in
 the Oak Cliff neighborhood; and
 WHEREAS, An exemplary citizen, Edna was respected for her
 numerous accomplishments and for her work in addressing
 inequities in southern Dallas; she began her career by working as
 a stockroom employee at Kmart and advanced into management
 positions, and she led various supply drives and community
 initiatives through her role with the company; her positive
 impact on the city and her fellow residents and neighbors
 included her efforts to enact a youth curfew to improve safety
 and crime, to extend bus lines for residents to access necessary
 services, and to save and revitalize the Southwest Center Mall,
 formerly the Red Bird Mall, in Dallas; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. P, as she was affectionately known to many,
 was active in numerous local organizations, including the Dallas
 Chapter NAACP, the Martin Luther King Center, and Camp Wisdom
 Now; she was a founder of Positively Oak Cliff, a nonprofit
 coalition of entrepreneurs and community leaders, and she served
 as a voter registrar and precinct chair in her local precinct;
 she was the recipient of numerous accolades, including several
 Governors' awards for her contributions to her community, and she
 was honored to serve as a torchbearer in Dallas ahead of the 1996
 Olympic Games in Atlanta; and
 WHEREAS, A role model of compassion and resilience, Edna
 was a friend to all and a mother-figure and mentor to many; she
 practiced her faith in her daily life, and she was an active and
 longtime member and community leader of Concord Missionary
 Baptist Church; her passion for helping others and her dedication
 to her Oak Cliff community made a lasting difference in the lives
 of innumerable people in their times of need and who were
 experiencing such challenges as natural disasters and financial
 struggles; and
 WHEREAS, Although Edna found immense fulfillment in her
 role as a community volunteer, advocate, and activist, above all,
 she cherished spending quality time together with those closest
 to her; her unflagging support and love for her family set a
 shining example for her children, who have gone on to serve as
 educators, community leaders, and volunteers; she was a devoted
 mother and grandmother and a revered figure in the Dallas
 community, and she leaves behind an extraordinary legacy and
 countless memories that will be treasured forever by her many
 loved ones and by all who were privileged to share in her life;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 89th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Edna Belle Pemberton; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Edna Pemberton.
 West
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 28, 2025, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate