House
|
03/22/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
On passage Passed by recorded vote: 209 - 204 (Roll no. 104). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1358)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 206 - 211 (Roll no. 103). (text: CR H1365)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1487-1488)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 1023 the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Peters demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Mr. Peters moved to recommit to the Committee on Energy and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, H. Res. 987 and H.R. 7023. The resolution provides for consideration H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, and H. Res. 987 under a closed rule, and H.R. 7023 under a structured rule, each with one hour of general debate. The rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, and H.R. 7023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1085. (consideration: CR H1358-1365)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1085 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, H. Res. 98and H.R. 7023. The resolution provides for consideration H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, and H. Res. 987 under a closed rule, and H.R. 7023 under a structured rule, each with one hour of general debate. The rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, and H.R. 7023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 17.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-26.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 11 - 6 .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Minerals.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|