7 | 5 | | To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to clarify the use of the |
---|
8 | 6 | | national coverage determination process under the Medicare program. |
---|
9 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
10 | 8 | | JANUARY9, 2023 |
---|
11 | 9 | | Mr. B |
---|
12 | 10 | | UCHANAN(for himself, Ms. BARRAGA´N, and Ms. SALAZAR) introduced |
---|
13 | 11 | | the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and |
---|
14 | 12 | | Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for |
---|
15 | 13 | | a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for |
---|
16 | 14 | | consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the com- |
---|
17 | 15 | | mittee concerned |
---|
18 | | - | N |
---|
19 | | - | OVEMBER22, 2024 |
---|
20 | | - | Reported from the Committee on Energy and Commerce with an amendment |
---|
21 | | - | [Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] |
---|
22 | | - | NOVEMBER22, 2024 |
---|
23 | | - | Referral to the Committee on Ways and Means extended for a period ending |
---|
24 | | - | not later than December 19, 2024 |
---|
25 | | - | D |
---|
26 | | - | ECEMBER19, 2024 |
---|
27 | | - | Additional sponsors: Mr. F |
---|
28 | | - | ITZPATRICK, Mr. FERGUSON, Mr. CAREYand Mrs. |
---|
29 | | - | M |
---|
30 | | - | ILLERof West Virginia |
---|
31 | | - | D |
---|
32 | | - | ECEMBER19, 2024 |
---|
33 | | - | Committee on Ways and Means discharged; committed to the Committee of |
---|
34 | | - | the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed |
---|
35 | | - | [For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on January 9, 2023] |
---|
36 | | - | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Dec 24, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H133.RH H133 |
---|
37 | | - | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
38 | | - | •HR 133 RH |
---|
50 | | - | Review of Individual Treatments Act’’ or the ‘‘MERIT 5 |
---|
51 | | - | Act’’. 6 |
---|
52 | | - | SEC. 2. CLARIFICATION ON MEDICARE NATIONAL COV-7 |
---|
53 | | - | ERAGE DETERMINATION PROCESS. 8 |
---|
54 | | - | Section 1862(a) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 9 |
---|
55 | | - | 1395y(a)) is amended by adding at the end the following 10 |
---|
56 | | - | new sentence: ‘‘For purposes of paragraph (1)(E), with re-11 |
---|
57 | | - | spect to a determination made on or after the date of the 12 |
---|
58 | | - | enactment of this sentence of whether a drug or biological 13 |
---|
59 | | - | is reasonable and necessary to carry out the purposes of 14 |
---|
60 | | - | such section, such determination shall be made with respect 15 |
---|
61 | | - | to each drug or biological involved and not with respect to 16 |
---|
62 | | - | a class of drugs or biologicals.’’. 17 |
---|
63 | | - | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Dec 24, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H133.RH H133 |
---|
64 | | - | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB Union Calendar No. |
---|
65 | | - | 779 |
---|
66 | | - | 118 |
---|
67 | | - | TH |
---|
68 | | - | CONGRESS |
---|
69 | | - | 2 |
---|
70 | | - | D |
---|
71 | | - | S |
---|
72 | | - | ESSION |
---|
73 | | - | |
---|
74 | | - | H. R. 133 |
---|
75 | | - | [Report No. 118–764, Part I] |
---|
76 | | - | A BILL |
---|
77 | | - | To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to |
---|
78 | | - | clarify the use of the national coverage deter- |
---|
79 | | - | mination process under the Medicare program. |
---|
80 | | - | D |
---|
81 | | - | ECEMBER |
---|
82 | | - | 19, 2024 |
---|
83 | | - | Committee on Ways and Means discharged; committed to |
---|
84 | | - | the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the |
---|
85 | | - | Union and ordered to be printed |
---|
86 | | - | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Dec 24, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H133.RH H133 |
---|
87 | | - | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB |
---|
| 24 | + | Review of Individual Treatments (MERIT) Act’’. 5 |
---|
| 25 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:51 Jan 18, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H133.IH H133 |
---|
| 26 | + | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
| 27 | + | •HR 133 IH |
---|
| 28 | + | SEC. 2. CLARIFICATION ON MEDICARE NATIONAL COV-1 |
---|
| 29 | + | ERAGE DETERMINATION PROCESS. 2 |
---|
| 30 | + | Section 1862(a) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 3 |
---|
| 31 | + | 1395y(a)) is amended by adding at the end the following 4 |
---|
| 32 | + | new sentence: ‘‘For purposes of paragraph (1)(E), in the 5 |
---|
| 33 | + | case of research conducted pursuant to section 1142, the 6 |
---|
| 34 | + | determination of whether a drug or biological is reasonable 7 |
---|
| 35 | + | and necessary to carry out the purposes of section 1142 8 |
---|
| 36 | + | shall be made with respect to each drug or biological in-9 |
---|
| 37 | + | volved and not with respect to a class of drugs or 10 |
---|
| 38 | + | biologicals.’’. 11 |
---|
| 39 | + | Æ |
---|
| 40 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:51 Jan 18, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H133.IH H133 |
---|
| 41 | + | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB |
---|