Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB133 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/24/2024

                            IB 
Union Calendar No. 779 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. R. 133 
[Report No. 118–764, Part I] 
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to clarify the use of the 
national coverage determination process under the Medicare program. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY9, 2023 
Mr. B
UCHANAN(for himself, Ms. BARRAGA´N, and Ms. SALAZAR) introduced 
the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and 
Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for 
a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for 
consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the com-
mittee concerned 
N
OVEMBER22, 2024 
Reported from the Committee on Energy and Commerce with an amendment 
[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] 
NOVEMBER22, 2024 
Referral to the Committee on Ways and Means extended for a period ending 
not later than December 19, 2024 
D
ECEMBER19, 2024 
Additional sponsors: Mr. F
ITZPATRICK, Mr. FERGUSON, Mr. CAREYand Mrs. 
M
ILLERof West Virginia 
D
ECEMBER19, 2024 
Committee on Ways and Means discharged; committed to the Committee of 
the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed 
[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on January 9, 2023] 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Dec 24, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H133.RH H133
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 133 RH
A BILL 
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to clarify 
the use of the national coverage determination process 
under the Medicare program. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Dec 24, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H133.RH H133
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 133 RH
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Mandating Exclusive 4
Review of Individual Treatments Act’’ or the ‘‘MERIT 5
Act’’. 6
SEC. 2. CLARIFICATION ON MEDICARE NATIONAL COV-7
ERAGE DETERMINATION PROCESS. 8
Section 1862(a) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 9
1395y(a)) is amended by adding at the end the following 10
new sentence: ‘‘For purposes of paragraph (1)(E), with re-11
spect to a determination made on or after the date of the 12
enactment of this sentence of whether a drug or biological 13
is reasonable and necessary to carry out the purposes of 14
such section, such determination shall be made with respect 15
to each drug or biological involved and not with respect to 16
a class of drugs or biologicals.’’. 17
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Dec 24, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H133.RH H133
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB Union Calendar No. 
779 
118
TH
CONGRESS 
2
D
S
ESSION
 
H. R. 133 
[Report No. 118–764, Part I] 
A BILL 
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to 
clarify the use of the national coverage deter-
mination process under the Medicare program. 
D
ECEMBER
19, 2024 
Committee on Ways and Means discharged; committed to 
the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the 
Union and ordered to be printed 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:24 Dec 24, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H133.RH H133
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB