Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 244 - 171 (Roll no. 473). (text: CR H6092)
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 202 - 211 (Roll no. 472).
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Ms. Stansbury moved to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources. (text: CR H6096)
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1449.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6094-6097)
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 1449 as unfinished business.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
On motion that the committee rise Agreed to by voice vote.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Mr. Westerman moved that the committee rise.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on Grijalva amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Grijalva demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1576, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Grijalva amendment No. 2.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on Grijalva amendment No. 1, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Grijalva demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1576, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Grijalva amendment No. 1.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1449.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 1576 and Rule XVIII.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
The Speaker designated the Honorable Nick LaLota to act as Chairman of the Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1449 and H.R. 9495. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1449 under a structured rule and H.R. 9495 under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1576. (consideration: CR H6089-6094)
|
|
|
House
|
11/18/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1576 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1449 and H.R. 9495. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1449 under a structured rule and H.R. 9495 under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 617.
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-730.
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Subcommittee Hearings Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|