7 | 5 | | To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to reinstate the exception |
---|
8 | 6 | | for de minimis payments by third party settlement organizations with |
---|
9 | 7 | | respect to returns relating to payments made in settlement of payment |
---|
10 | 8 | | card and third party network transactions, as in effect prior to the |
---|
11 | 9 | | enactment of the American Rescue Plan Act. |
---|
12 | 10 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
13 | 11 | | JANUARY9, 2023 |
---|
14 | 12 | | Mrs. M |
---|
15 | 13 | | ILLERof West Virginia (for herself, Mr. BUCHANAN, Mr. FERGUSON, |
---|
16 | 14 | | Mr. E |
---|
17 | 15 | | STES, Mr. KELLYof Pennsylvania, Mr. ARRINGTON, Mr. |
---|
18 | 16 | | S |
---|
19 | 17 | | CHWEIKERT, Mr. MURPHY, Mr. KUSTOFF, Mr. SMUCKER, Mr. SMITH |
---|
20 | 18 | | of Nebraska, Mr. W |
---|
21 | 19 | | ENSTRUP, Mr. LAHOOD, and Mr. HERN) introduced |
---|
22 | 20 | | the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and |
---|
23 | 21 | | Means |
---|
24 | | - | D |
---|
25 | | - | ECEMBER10, 2024 |
---|
26 | | - | Additional sponsors: Ms. M |
---|
27 | | - | ALLIOTAKIS, Ms. VANDUYNE, Mr. STEWART, Ms. |
---|
28 | | - | T |
---|
29 | | - | ENNEY, Mr. MOOREof Utah, Mr. FITZPATRICK, Mr. STEUBE, Mr. |
---|
30 | | - | F |
---|
31 | | - | EENSTRA, Mr. MOOLENAAR, Mr. CAREY, Mrs. FISCHBACH, Mrs. STEEL, |
---|
32 | | - | Mr. N |
---|
33 | | - | ORMAN, Mr. DUNCAN, Mr. PERRY, Mr. MCCLINTOCK, Mr. SANTOS, |
---|
34 | | - | Mr. F |
---|
35 | | - | INSTAD, Mr. VALADAO, Mr. CLINE, Mrs. MILLER-MEEKS, Ms. LEE |
---|
36 | | - | of Florida, Mrs. B |
---|
37 | | - | ICE, Mr. WILLIAMSof New York, Mrs. HARSHBARGER, |
---|
38 | | - | Mr. M |
---|
39 | | - | ORAN, Mr. EZELL, Mr. YAKYM, Mr. BIGGS, Mrs. CAMMACK, Mr. |
---|
40 | | - | M |
---|
41 | | - | OONEY, Mr. LALOTA, Mr. CALVERT, Mr. GALLAGHER, and Mr. POSEY |
---|
42 | | - | D |
---|
43 | | - | ECEMBER10, 2024 |
---|
44 | | - | Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole |
---|
45 | | - | House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed |
---|
46 | | - | [Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] |
---|
47 | | - | [For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on January 9, 2023] |
---|
48 | | - | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:11 Dec 11, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H190.RH H190 |
---|
49 | | - | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
50 | | - | •HR 190 RH |
---|
63 | | - | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 |
---|
64 | | - | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Saving Gig Economy 4 |
---|
65 | | - | Taxpayers Act’’. 5 |
---|
66 | | - | SEC. 2. REINSTATEMENT OF EXCEPTION FOR DE MINIMIS 6 |
---|
67 | | - | PAYMENTS AS IN EFFECT PRIOR TO ENACT-7 |
---|
68 | | - | MENT OF AMERICAN RESCUE PLAN ACT. 8 |
---|
| 31 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:08 Jan 19, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H190.IH H190 |
---|
| 32 | + | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
| 33 | + | •HR 190 IH |
---|
| 34 | + | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 1 |
---|
| 35 | + | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Saving Gig Economy 2 |
---|
| 36 | + | Taxpayers Act’’. 3 |
---|
| 37 | + | SEC. 2. REINSTATEMENT OF EXCEPTION FOR DE MINIMIS 4 |
---|
| 38 | + | PAYMENTS AS IN EFFECT PRIOR TO ENACT-5 |
---|
| 39 | + | MENT OF AMERICAN RESCUE PLAN ACT. 6 |
---|
75 | | - | HIRDPARTYSETTLEMENTORGANIZATIONS.—A third 12 |
---|
76 | | - | party settlement organization shall be required to report 13 |
---|
77 | | - | any information under subsection (a) with respect to third 14 |
---|
78 | | - | party network transactions of any participating payee only 15 |
---|
79 | | - | if— 16 |
---|
80 | | - | ‘‘(1) the amount which would otherwise be re-17 |
---|
81 | | - | ported under subsection (a)(2) with respect to such 18 |
---|
82 | | - | transactions exceeds $20,000, and 19 |
---|
83 | | - | ‘‘(2) the aggregate number of such transactions 20 |
---|
84 | | - | exceeds 200.’’. 21 |
---|
| 46 | + | HIRDPARTYSETTLEMENT ORGANIZATIONS.—A third 10 |
---|
| 47 | + | party settlement organization shall be required to report 11 |
---|
| 48 | + | any information under subsection (a) with respect to third 12 |
---|
| 49 | + | party network transactions of any participating payee only 13 |
---|
| 50 | + | if— 14 |
---|
| 51 | + | ‘‘(1) the amount which would otherwise be re-15 |
---|
| 52 | + | ported under subsection (a)(2) with respect to such 16 |
---|
| 53 | + | transactions exceeds $20,000, and 17 |
---|
| 54 | + | ‘‘(2) the aggregate number of such transactions 18 |
---|
| 55 | + | exceeds 200.’’. 19 |
---|
86 | | - | FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendment made by this 22 |
---|
87 | | - | section shall apply to returns for calendar years beginning 23 |
---|
88 | | - | after December 31, 2021. 24 |
---|
89 | | - | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:11 Dec 11, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H190.RH H190 |
---|
90 | | - | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB Union Calendar No. |
---|
91 | | - | 696 |
---|
92 | | - | 118 |
---|
93 | | - | TH |
---|
94 | | - | CONGRESS |
---|
95 | | - | 2 |
---|
96 | | - | D |
---|
97 | | - | S |
---|
98 | | - | ESSION |
---|
99 | | - | |
---|
100 | | - | H. R. 190 |
---|
101 | | - | [Report No. 118–857] |
---|
102 | | - | A BILL |
---|
103 | | - | To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to |
---|
104 | | - | reinstate the exception for de minimis payments |
---|
105 | | - | by third party settlement organizations with re- |
---|
106 | | - | spect to returns relating to payments made in |
---|
107 | | - | settlement of payment card and third party net- |
---|
108 | | - | work transactions, as in effect prior to the enact- |
---|
109 | | - | ment of the American Rescue Plan Act. |
---|
110 | | - | D |
---|
111 | | - | ECEMBER |
---|
112 | | - | 10, 2024 |
---|
113 | | - | Reported with an amendment, committed to the Com- |
---|
114 | | - | mittee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, |
---|
115 | | - | and ordered to be printed |
---|
116 | | - | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:11 Dec 11, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H190.RH H190 |
---|
117 | | - | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB |
---|
| 57 | + | FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendment made by 20 |
---|
| 58 | + | this section shall take effect as if included in section 9674 21 |
---|
| 59 | + | of the American Rescue Plan Act. 22 |
---|
| 60 | + | Æ |
---|
| 61 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:08 Jan 19, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H190.IH H190 |
---|
| 62 | + | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS |
---|