Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB190 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/11/2024

                            IB 
Union Calendar No. 696 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. R. 190 
[Report No. 118–857] 
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to reinstate the exception 
for de minimis payments by third party settlement organizations with 
respect to returns relating to payments made in settlement of payment 
card and third party network transactions, as in effect prior to the 
enactment of the American Rescue Plan Act. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY9, 2023 
Mrs. M
ILLERof West Virginia (for herself, Mr. BUCHANAN, Mr. FERGUSON, 
Mr. E
STES, Mr. KELLYof Pennsylvania, Mr. ARRINGTON, Mr. 
S
CHWEIKERT, Mr. MURPHY, Mr. KUSTOFF, Mr. SMUCKER, Mr. SMITH 
of Nebraska, Mr. W
ENSTRUP, Mr. LAHOOD, and Mr. HERN) introduced 
the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and 
Means 
D
ECEMBER10, 2024 
Additional sponsors: Ms. M
ALLIOTAKIS, Ms. VANDUYNE, Mr. STEWART, Ms. 
T
ENNEY, Mr. MOOREof Utah, Mr. FITZPATRICK, Mr. STEUBE, Mr. 
F
EENSTRA, Mr. MOOLENAAR, Mr. CAREY, Mrs. FISCHBACH, Mrs. STEEL, 
Mr. N
ORMAN, Mr. DUNCAN, Mr. PERRY, Mr. MCCLINTOCK, Mr. SANTOS, 
Mr. F
INSTAD, Mr. VALADAO, Mr. CLINE, Mrs. MILLER-MEEKS, Ms. LEE 
of Florida, Mrs. B
ICE, Mr. WILLIAMSof New York, Mrs. HARSHBARGER, 
Mr. M
ORAN, Mr. EZELL, Mr. YAKYM, Mr. BIGGS, Mrs. CAMMACK, Mr. 
M
OONEY, Mr. LALOTA, Mr. CALVERT, Mr. GALLAGHER, and Mr. POSEY 
D
ECEMBER10, 2024 
Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole 
House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed 
[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] 
[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on January 9, 2023] 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:11 Dec 11, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H190.RH H190
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 190 RH
A BILL 
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to reinstate 
the exception for de minimis payments by third party 
settlement organizations with respect to returns relating 
to payments made in settlement of payment card and 
third party network transactions, as in effect prior to 
the enactment of the American Rescue Plan Act. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:11 Dec 11, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H190.RH H190
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 190 RH
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Saving Gig Economy 4
Taxpayers Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. REINSTATEMENT OF EXCEPTION FOR DE MINIMIS 6
PAYMENTS AS IN EFFECT PRIOR TO ENACT-7
MENT OF AMERICAN RESCUE PLAN ACT. 8
(a) I
NGENERAL.—Section 6050W(e) of the Internal 9
Revenue Code of 1986 is amended to read as follows: 10
‘‘(e) E
XCEPTION FOR DEMINIMISPAYMENTS BY 11
T
HIRDPARTYSETTLEMENTORGANIZATIONS.—A third 12
party settlement organization shall be required to report 13
any information under subsection (a) with respect to third 14
party network transactions of any participating payee only 15
if— 16
‘‘(1) the amount which would otherwise be re-17
ported under subsection (a)(2) with respect to such 18
transactions exceeds $20,000, and 19
‘‘(2) the aggregate number of such transactions 20
exceeds 200.’’. 21
(b) E
FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendment made by this 22
section shall apply to returns for calendar years beginning 23
after December 31, 2021. 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:11 Dec 11, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H190.RH H190
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB Union Calendar No. 
696 
118
TH
CONGRESS 
2
D
S
ESSION
 
H. R. 190 
[Report No. 118–857] 
A BILL 
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to 
reinstate the exception for de minimis payments 
by third party settlement organizations with re-
spect to returns relating to payments made in 
settlement of payment card and third party net-
work transactions, as in effect prior to the enact-
ment of the American Rescue Plan Act. 
D
ECEMBER
10, 2024 
Reported with an amendment, committed to the Com-
mittee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, 
and ordered to be printed 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:11 Dec 11, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H190.RH H190
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB