Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 414.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
On passage Passed by recorded vote: 262 - 143 (Roll no. 232).
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 195 - 212 (Roll no. 231).
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3509-3511)
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 192, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the nays had prevailed. Mr. Robert Garcia (CA) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Mr. Garcia, Robert moved to recommit to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability. (text: CR H3496)
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 192.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4763, H.R. 5403 and H.R. 192. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each bill. H.R. 4763 and H.R. 5403 are considered under a structured rule and H.R. 192 is considered under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1243. (consideration: CR H3489-3496)
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Rule H. Res. 1243 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1243 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4763, H.R. 5403 and H.R. 192. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each bill. H.R. 4763 and H.R. 5403 are considered under a structured rule and H.R. 192 is considered under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 118.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Accountability. H. Rept. 118-150.
|
|
|
House
|
07/12/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 19.
|
|
|
House
|
07/12/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|