House | 07/24/2024 | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Fong asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 2989, a bill originally introduced by Representative McCarthy, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Committee Hearings Held. | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced in House |