7 | 5 | | To amend the Defense Production Act of 1950 to include the Secretary |
---|
8 | 6 | | of Agriculture as a member of the Committee on Foreign Investment |
---|
9 | 7 | | in the United States, and for other purposes. |
---|
10 | 8 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
11 | 9 | | MAY16, 2023 |
---|
12 | 10 | | Mr. L |
---|
13 | 11 | | UCASintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee |
---|
14 | 12 | | on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and |
---|
15 | 13 | | Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently deter- |
---|
16 | 14 | | mined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions |
---|
17 | 15 | | as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned |
---|
18 | | - | D |
---|
19 | | - | ECEMBER5, 2024 |
---|
20 | | - | Reported from the Committee on Financial Services with an amendment |
---|
21 | | - | [Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] |
---|
22 | | - | DECEMBER5, 2024 |
---|
23 | | - | Referral to the Committees on Energy and Commerce and Foreign Affairs |
---|
24 | | - | extended for a period ending not later than December 19, 2024 |
---|
25 | | - | D |
---|
26 | | - | ECEMBER19, 2024 |
---|
27 | | - | Additional sponsors: Mr. B |
---|
28 | | - | ACON, Mr. NUNNof Iowa, Mr. SHERMAN, Mr. |
---|
29 | | - | B |
---|
30 | | - | ARR, Ms. SLOTKINand Ms. BLUNTROCHESTER |
---|
31 | | - | D |
---|
32 | | - | ECEMBER19, 2024 |
---|
33 | | - | Committees on Energy and Commerce and Foreign Affairs discharged; com- |
---|
34 | | - | mitted to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union |
---|
35 | | - | and ordered to be printed |
---|
36 | | - | [For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on May 16, 2023] |
---|
37 | | - | VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:07 Dec 27, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H3378.RH H3378 |
---|
38 | | - | DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
39 | | - | •HR 3378 RH |
---|
53 | | - | SEC. 2. AGRICULTURE REPRESENTATIVE. 6 |
---|
54 | | - | Section 721(k)(2) of the Defense Production Act of 7 |
---|
55 | | - | 1950 (50 U.S.C. 4565(k)(2)) is amended— 8 |
---|
56 | | - | (1) by redesignating subparagraphs (H), (I), and 9 |
---|
57 | | - | (J) as subparagraphs (I), (J), and (K), respectively; 10 |
---|
58 | | - | and 11 |
---|
59 | | - | (2) by inserting after subparagraph (G) the fol-12 |
---|
60 | | - | lowing: 13 |
---|
61 | | - | ‘‘(H) The Secretary of Agriculture, with re-14 |
---|
62 | | - | spect to all covered transactions involving the 15 |
---|
63 | | - | purchase of agricultural land, agriculture bio-16 |
---|
64 | | - | technology, and any other covered transaction re-17 |
---|
65 | | - | lated to the agriculture industry in the United 18 |
---|
66 | | - | States.’’. 19 |
---|
67 | | - | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:12 Dec 27, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3378.RH H3378 |
---|
68 | | - | DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS Union Calendar No. |
---|
69 | | - | 783 |
---|
70 | | - | 118 |
---|
71 | | - | TH |
---|
72 | | - | CONGRESS |
---|
73 | | - | 2 |
---|
74 | | - | D |
---|
75 | | - | S |
---|
76 | | - | ESSION |
---|
77 | | - | |
---|
78 | | - | H. R. 3378 |
---|
79 | | - | [Report No. 118–798, Part I] |
---|
80 | | - | A BILL |
---|
81 | | - | To amend the Defense Production Act of 1950 to |
---|
82 | | - | include the Secretary of Agriculture as a member |
---|
83 | | - | of the Committee on Foreign Investment in the |
---|
84 | | - | United States, and for other purposes. |
---|
85 | | - | D |
---|
86 | | - | ECEMBER |
---|
87 | | - | 19, 2024 |
---|
88 | | - | Committees on Energy and Commerce and Foreign Af- |
---|
89 | | - | fairs discharged; committed to the Committee of the |
---|
90 | | - | Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered |
---|
91 | | - | to be printed |
---|
92 | | - | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:12 Dec 27, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H3378.RH H3378 |
---|
93 | | - | DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS |
---|
| 26 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:20 May 31, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H3378.IH H3378 |
---|
| 27 | + | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
| 28 | + | •HR 3378 IH |
---|
| 29 | + | SEC. 2. AGRICULTURE REPRESENTATIVE. 1 |
---|
| 30 | + | Section 721(k)(2) of the Defense Production Act of 2 |
---|
| 31 | + | 1950 (50 U.S.C. 4565(k)(2)) is amended— 3 |
---|
| 32 | + | (1) by redesignating subparagraphs (H), (I), 4 |
---|
| 33 | + | and (J) as subparagraphs (I), (J), and (K), respec-5 |
---|
| 34 | + | tively; and 6 |
---|
| 35 | + | (2) by inserting after subparagraph (G) the fol-7 |
---|
| 36 | + | lowing: 8 |
---|
| 37 | + | ‘‘(H) The Secretary of Agriculture, on all 9 |
---|
| 38 | + | transactions related to the purchase of agri-10 |
---|
| 39 | + | culture land, agriculture biotechnology, and any 11 |
---|
| 40 | + | other transaction related to the agriculture in-12 |
---|
| 41 | + | dustry in the United States, as determined by 13 |
---|
| 42 | + | the Secretary of Agriculture.’’. 14 |
---|
| 43 | + | Æ |
---|
| 44 | + | VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:20 May 31, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H3378.IH H3378 |
---|
| 45 | + | kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS |
---|