Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB3378 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/27/2024

                            IB 
Union Calendar No. 783 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. R. 3378 
[Report No. 118–798, Part I] 
To amend the Defense Production Act of 1950 to include the Secretary 
of Agriculture as a member of the Committee on Foreign Investment 
in the United States, and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY16, 2023 
Mr. L
UCASintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee 
on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and 
Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently deter-
mined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions 
as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned 
D
ECEMBER5, 2024 
Reported from the Committee on Financial Services with an amendment 
[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] 
DECEMBER5, 2024 
Referral to the Committees on Energy and Commerce and Foreign Affairs 
extended for a period ending not later than December 19, 2024 
D
ECEMBER19, 2024 
Additional sponsors: Mr. B
ACON, Mr. NUNNof Iowa, Mr. SHERMAN, Mr. 
B
ARR, Ms. SLOTKINand Ms. BLUNTROCHESTER 
D
ECEMBER19, 2024 
Committees on Energy and Commerce and Foreign Affairs discharged; com-
mitted to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union 
and ordered to be printed 
[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on May 16, 2023] 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:07 Dec 27, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H3378.RH H3378
DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 3378 RH
A BILL 
To amend the Defense Production Act of 1950 to include 
the Secretary of Agriculture as a member of the Com-
mittee on Foreign Investment in the United States, and 
for other purposes. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:12 Dec 27, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H3378.RH H3378
DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 3 
•HR 3378 RH
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Agricultural Security 4
Risk Review Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. AGRICULTURE REPRESENTATIVE. 6
Section 721(k)(2) of the Defense Production Act of 7
1950 (50 U.S.C. 4565(k)(2)) is amended— 8
(1) by redesignating subparagraphs (H), (I), and 9
(J) as subparagraphs (I), (J), and (K), respectively; 10
and 11
(2) by inserting after subparagraph (G) the fol-12
lowing: 13
‘‘(H) The Secretary of Agriculture, with re-14
spect to all covered transactions involving the 15
purchase of agricultural land, agriculture bio-16
technology, and any other covered transaction re-17
lated to the agriculture industry in the United 18
States.’’. 19
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:12 Dec 27, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3378.RH H3378
DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS Union Calendar No. 
783 
118
TH
CONGRESS 
2
D
S
ESSION
 
H. R. 3378 
[Report No. 118–798, Part I] 
A BILL 
To amend the Defense Production Act of 1950 to 
include the Secretary of Agriculture as a member 
of the Committee on Foreign Investment in the 
United States, and for other purposes. 
D
ECEMBER
19, 2024 
Committees on Energy and Commerce and Foreign Af-
fairs discharged; committed to the Committee of the 
Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered 
to be printed 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:12 Dec 27, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H3378.RH H3378
DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS