House
|
06/03/2023
|
Became Public Law No: 118-4.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2023
|
Signed by President.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Presented to President.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H. R. 346.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Mr. Stauber moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H2481-2482)
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1571-1572)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
S.Amdt.89 Amendment SA 89 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
S.Amdt.89 Amendment SA 89 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Cantwell. (consideration: CR S1571-1572) In the nature of a substitute.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1571-1572)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 4 (Roll no. 34). (text: CR H299)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H311-312)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 346.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H299-301)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Mr. Graves (MO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|