Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 185 (Roll no. 213). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H3295)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3308)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 354, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Moore (AL) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 354.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 8146, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213 and H. Res. 1210. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213, and H. Res. 1210 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7343 and H.R. 8146 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, and H.R. 8146.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1227. (consideration: CR H3294-3297)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1227 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 8146, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213 and H. Res. 1210. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, H. Res. 1213, and H. Res. 1210 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7343 and H.R. 8146 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate each. Rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 8369, H.R. 7530, H.R. 7343, H.R. 7581, H.R. 354, and H.R. 8146.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 418.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 118-502.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 15 - 9.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|