Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Received in the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2691)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3722.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2691-2693)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Mrs. Kiggans (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-380, Part I.
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Subcommittee Hearings Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/17/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|