Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 7 (Roll no. 65). (text: 3/5/2024 CR H796)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H971-972)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3821.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H796-797)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Mr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 197.
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-247.
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 51 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
07/13/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/13/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|