Senate
|
09/19/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
09/18/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
09/18/2023
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 392). (text: CR H4357)
|
|
|
House
|
09/18/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4369-4370)
|
|
|
House
|
09/18/2023
|
At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
09/18/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3981.
|
|
|
House
|
09/18/2023
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4357-4358)
|
|
|
House
|
09/18/2023
|
Mr. Bost moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 153.
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-190.
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Subcommittee Hearings Held
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|