1 | 1 | | I |
---|
2 | 2 | | 118THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. R. 433 |
---|
5 | 5 | | To establish a moratorium on oil and gas leasing on public land on the |
---|
6 | 6 | | Central Coast of California. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | JANUARY20, 2023 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. P |
---|
10 | 10 | | ANETTAintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the |
---|
11 | 11 | | Committee on Natural Resources |
---|
12 | 12 | | A BILL |
---|
13 | 13 | | To establish a moratorium on oil and gas leasing on public |
---|
14 | 14 | | land on the Central Coast of California. |
---|
15 | 15 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 |
---|
16 | 16 | | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 |
---|
17 | 17 | | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 |
---|
18 | 18 | | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘California Central 4 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Coast Conservation Act’’. 5 |
---|
20 | 20 | | SEC. 2. MORATORIUM ON OIL AND GAS LEASING ON PUB-6 |
---|
21 | 21 | | LIC LAND ON THE CENTRAL COAST OF CALI-7 |
---|
22 | 22 | | FORNIA. 8 |
---|
23 | 23 | | Section 17(a) of the Mineral Leasing Act (30 U.S.C. 9 |
---|
24 | 24 | | 226(a)) is amended by adding at the end the following: 10 |
---|
25 | 25 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:32 Feb 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H433.IH H433 |
---|
26 | 26 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
27 | 27 | | •HR 433 IH |
---|
28 | 28 | | ‘‘(r) MORATORIUM ON OIL ANDGASLEASING ON 1 |
---|
29 | 29 | | P |
---|
30 | 30 | | UBLICLAND ON THE CENTRALCOAST OFCALI-2 |
---|
31 | 31 | | FORNIA.— 3 |
---|
32 | 32 | | ‘‘(1) I |
---|
33 | 33 | | N GENERAL.—Notwithstanding any other 4 |
---|
34 | 34 | | provision of this Act or any other law and except as 5 |
---|
35 | 35 | | provided in paragraph (2), beginning on the date of 6 |
---|
36 | 36 | | enactment of this subsection, the Record of Decision 7 |
---|
37 | 37 | | for the Central Coast Field Office Resource Manage-8 |
---|
38 | 38 | | ment Plan Amendment for Oil and Gas Leasing and 9 |
---|
39 | 39 | | Development published on October 7, 2019 (84 Fed. 10 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Reg. 53470), shall have no force or effect until the 11 |
---|
41 | 41 | | Bureau of Land Management Central Coast Field 12 |
---|
42 | 42 | | Office completes and circulates for public comment 13 |
---|
43 | 43 | | a supplemental environmental impact statement 14 |
---|
44 | 44 | | under section 102 of the National Environmental 15 |
---|
45 | 45 | | Policy Act of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4332) and chapter 5 16 |
---|
46 | 46 | | of title 5, United States Code, that considers the en-17 |
---|
47 | 47 | | vironmental effects of all oil and gas development 18 |
---|
48 | 48 | | authorized to occur under the Bureau of Land Man-19 |
---|
49 | 49 | | agement’s preferred alternative ‘Alternative F’, 20 |
---|
50 | 50 | | which appears in the final Environmental Impact 21 |
---|
51 | 51 | | Statement published on May 10, 2019 (84 Fed. Reg. 22 |
---|
52 | 52 | | 20657), but was not included or analyzed in the 23 |
---|
53 | 53 | | Draft Environmental Impact Statement published 24 |
---|
54 | 54 | | January 6, 2017 (82 Fed. Reg. 1754), along with 25 |
---|
55 | 55 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:32 Feb 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H433.IH H433 |
---|
56 | 56 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 |
---|
57 | 57 | | •HR 433 IH |
---|
58 | 58 | | the environmental effects of oil and gas development 1 |
---|
59 | 59 | | that would be authorized as a result of such record 2 |
---|
60 | 60 | | of decision, including such effects on— 3 |
---|
61 | 61 | | ‘‘(A) air quality; 4 |
---|
62 | 62 | | ‘‘(B) greenhouse gas emissions and the cli-5 |
---|
63 | 63 | | mate; 6 |
---|
64 | 64 | | ‘‘(C) groundwater quality and availability; 7 |
---|
65 | 65 | | ‘‘(D) surface water quality and availability; 8 |
---|
66 | 66 | | ‘‘(E) seismicity; 9 |
---|
67 | 67 | | ‘‘(F) wildlife and plant species, including 10 |
---|
68 | 68 | | threatened species and endangered species; and 11 |
---|
69 | 69 | | ‘‘(G) low-income communities, communities 12 |
---|
70 | 70 | | of color, and indigenous communities, including 13 |
---|
71 | 71 | | federally and State-recognized Indian Tribes. 14 |
---|
72 | 72 | | ‘‘(2) N |
---|
73 | 73 | | EW REVIEW.—If the supplemental envi-15 |
---|
74 | 74 | | ronmental impact statement under paragraph (1) 16 |
---|
75 | 75 | | finds any significant detrimental effects on any mat-17 |
---|
76 | 76 | | ter described in subparagraphs (A) through (G) of 18 |
---|
77 | 77 | | such paragraph, the Record of Decision referred to 19 |
---|
78 | 78 | | in paragraph (1) shall have no force or effect and 20 |
---|
79 | 79 | | the Director of the Bureau of Land Management 21 |
---|
80 | 80 | | shall conduct a new review of Federal oil and gas 22 |
---|
81 | 81 | | leasing on the Central Coast of California under sec-23 |
---|
82 | 82 | | tion 102 of the National Environmental Policy Act 24 |
---|
83 | 83 | | of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4332). 25 |
---|
84 | 84 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:32 Feb 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H433.IH H433 |
---|
85 | 85 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 4 |
---|
86 | 86 | | •HR 433 IH |
---|
87 | 87 | | ‘‘(3) ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY 1 |
---|
88 | 88 | | REVIEW.— 2 |
---|
89 | 89 | | ‘‘(A) After the date of the publication, pur-3 |
---|
90 | 90 | | suant to paragraph (2), of a supplemental envi-4 |
---|
91 | 91 | | ronmental impact statement under section 5 |
---|
92 | 92 | | 102(2)(C) of the National Environmental Policy 6 |
---|
93 | 93 | | Act of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4332(2)(C)), the Ad-7 |
---|
94 | 94 | | ministrator of the Environmental Protection 8 |
---|
95 | 95 | | Agency shall review and publish comments re-9 |
---|
96 | 96 | | garding such statement, including— 10 |
---|
97 | 97 | | ‘‘(i) identification of any significant 11 |
---|
98 | 98 | | environmental impacts of oil and gas leas-12 |
---|
99 | 99 | | ing on the Central Coast of California that 13 |
---|
100 | 100 | | should be avoided to adequately protect the 14 |
---|
101 | 101 | | region’s natural resources; or 15 |
---|
102 | 102 | | ‘‘(ii) a determination that the supple-16 |
---|
103 | 103 | | mental environmental impact statement 17 |
---|
104 | 104 | | does not contain sufficient information to 18 |
---|
105 | 105 | | assess such impacts. 19 |
---|
106 | 106 | | ‘‘(B) If the Administrator identifies signifi-20 |
---|
107 | 107 | | cant impacts under subparagraph (A)(i) or 21 |
---|
108 | 108 | | makes a determination described in subpara-22 |
---|
109 | 109 | | graph (A)(ii), the Director of the Bureau of 23 |
---|
110 | 110 | | Land Management shall consult with the Ad-24 |
---|
111 | 111 | | ministrator before taking any action to proceed 25 |
---|
112 | 112 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:32 Feb 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H433.IH H433 |
---|
113 | 113 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 5 |
---|
114 | 114 | | •HR 433 IH |
---|
115 | 115 | | with Federal oil and gas leasing on the Central 1 |
---|
116 | 116 | | Coast of California. 2 |
---|
117 | 117 | | ‘‘(4) E |
---|
118 | 118 | | FFECT.—Nothing in this subsection af-3 |
---|
119 | 119 | | fects any rights under leases issued under this Act 4 |
---|
120 | 120 | | before the date of enactment of this subsection.’’. 5 |
---|
121 | 121 | | Æ |
---|
122 | 122 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:32 Feb 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H433.IH H433 |
---|
123 | 123 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB |
---|