Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB433 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/02/2023

                            I 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 433 
To establish a moratorium on oil and gas leasing on public land on the 
Central Coast of California. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY20, 2023 
Mr. P
ANETTAintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the 
Committee on Natural Resources 
A BILL 
To establish a moratorium on oil and gas leasing on public 
land on the Central Coast of California. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘California Central 4
Coast Conservation Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. MORATORIUM ON OIL AND GAS LEASING ON PUB-6
LIC LAND ON THE CENTRAL COAST OF CALI-7
FORNIA. 8
Section 17(a) of the Mineral Leasing Act (30 U.S.C. 9
226(a)) is amended by adding at the end the following: 10
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:32 Feb 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H433.IH H433
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 433 IH
‘‘(r) MORATORIUM ON OIL ANDGASLEASING ON 1
P
UBLICLAND ON THE CENTRALCOAST OFCALI-2
FORNIA.— 3
‘‘(1) I
N GENERAL.—Notwithstanding any other 4
provision of this Act or any other law and except as 5
provided in paragraph (2), beginning on the date of 6
enactment of this subsection, the Record of Decision 7
for the Central Coast Field Office Resource Manage-8
ment Plan Amendment for Oil and Gas Leasing and 9
Development published on October 7, 2019 (84 Fed. 10
Reg. 53470), shall have no force or effect until the 11
Bureau of Land Management Central Coast Field 12
Office completes and circulates for public comment 13
a supplemental environmental impact statement 14
under section 102 of the National Environmental 15
Policy Act of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4332) and chapter 5 16
of title 5, United States Code, that considers the en-17
vironmental effects of all oil and gas development 18
authorized to occur under the Bureau of Land Man-19
agement’s preferred alternative ‘Alternative F’, 20
which appears in the final Environmental Impact 21
Statement published on May 10, 2019 (84 Fed. Reg. 22
20657), but was not included or analyzed in the 23
Draft Environmental Impact Statement published 24
January 6, 2017 (82 Fed. Reg. 1754), along with 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:32 Feb 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H433.IH H433
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 433 IH
the environmental effects of oil and gas development 1
that would be authorized as a result of such record 2
of decision, including such effects on— 3
‘‘(A) air quality; 4
‘‘(B) greenhouse gas emissions and the cli-5
mate; 6
‘‘(C) groundwater quality and availability; 7
‘‘(D) surface water quality and availability; 8
‘‘(E) seismicity; 9
‘‘(F) wildlife and plant species, including 10
threatened species and endangered species; and 11
‘‘(G) low-income communities, communities 12
of color, and indigenous communities, including 13
federally and State-recognized Indian Tribes. 14
‘‘(2) N
EW REVIEW.—If the supplemental envi-15
ronmental impact statement under paragraph (1) 16
finds any significant detrimental effects on any mat-17
ter described in subparagraphs (A) through (G) of 18
such paragraph, the Record of Decision referred to 19
in paragraph (1) shall have no force or effect and 20
the Director of the Bureau of Land Management 21
shall conduct a new review of Federal oil and gas 22
leasing on the Central Coast of California under sec-23
tion 102 of the National Environmental Policy Act 24
of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4332). 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:32 Feb 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H433.IH H433
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•HR 433 IH
‘‘(3) ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY 1
REVIEW.— 2
‘‘(A) After the date of the publication, pur-3
suant to paragraph (2), of a supplemental envi-4
ronmental impact statement under section 5
102(2)(C) of the National Environmental Policy 6
Act of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4332(2)(C)), the Ad-7
ministrator of the Environmental Protection 8
Agency shall review and publish comments re-9
garding such statement, including— 10
‘‘(i) identification of any significant 11
environmental impacts of oil and gas leas-12
ing on the Central Coast of California that 13
should be avoided to adequately protect the 14
region’s natural resources; or 15
‘‘(ii) a determination that the supple-16
mental environmental impact statement 17
does not contain sufficient information to 18
assess such impacts. 19
‘‘(B) If the Administrator identifies signifi-20
cant impacts under subparagraph (A)(i) or 21
makes a determination described in subpara-22
graph (A)(ii), the Director of the Bureau of 23
Land Management shall consult with the Ad-24
ministrator before taking any action to proceed 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:32 Feb 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H433.IH H433
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 5 
•HR 433 IH
with Federal oil and gas leasing on the Central 1
Coast of California. 2
‘‘(4) E
FFECT.—Nothing in this subsection af-3
fects any rights under leases issued under this Act 4
before the date of enactment of this subsection.’’. 5
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:32 Feb 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H433.IH H433
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB