Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Received in the Senate (Legislative Day, April 10, 2024).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2296)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 524.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2296-2298)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Mr. Tiffany moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 347.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-421.
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Subcommittee Hearings Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|